CT HB06519 | 2013 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - File Number 576
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require the labeling of genetically engineered food.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Labeling Of Genetically-engineered Food.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18HouseFile Number 576
2013-04-18HouseHouse Calendar Number 362
2013-04-18HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2013-04-18HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-04-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
2013-04-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
2013-04-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-04-02HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2013-03-07HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2013-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback