CT HB06509 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To add the cochairpersons and ranking members of the Judiciary Committee to the membership of the Connecticut Sentencing Commission.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Connecticut Sentencing Commission Regarding The Membership Of The Commission.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Gary Winfield [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] |
Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Sen. John Kissel [R] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 565 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 384 (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 384 (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Public Act 13-201 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 708 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2013-06-04 | House | House Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | File Number 665 |
2013-05-01 | House | House Calendar Number 458 |
2013-05-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |