CT HB06501 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow a parent, guardian or grandparent having custody of a school age child to take up to twenty hours of parental leave annually from their employment to attend qualified school-related activities involving such child.
Title
An Act Concerning Parental Engagement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | House | File Number 225 |
2013-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 168 |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |