CT HB06500 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make additional revisions to the state's hemp program statute, as required by the federal government.
Title
An Act Concerning Supplemental Revisions To The State's Hemp Program Statute.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. John Hennessy [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 367 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 85 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 85 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | House | Public Act 21-89 |
2021-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 408 |
2021-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | House Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | File Number 207 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 178 |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |