CT HB06499 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To include genocide education in the materials provided by the Department of Education to school districts for student curriculum and educator in-service training; to classify American sign language as a foreign language for purposes of the prescribed education curriculum; to include the international baccalaureate diploma program as part of the definition of "advanced placement course program"; to require the State Board of Education to adopt regulations that create a certification endorsement area in computer and information technology that allows computer and information technology teachers to teach in grades kindergarten to twelve, inclusive; to require that the legislative body of a school district receive a copy of a completed mediation and arbitration decision; to amend certain reporting requirements; to change the month that a teacher shall be notified that such teacher's contract will not be renewed for the following year from April to May; to allow superintendents limited access to information in the state-wide public school information system; to require boards of education to provide written notice to parents that unexcused absences could result in a complaint filed with the Superior Court; to require the State Board of Education to define "excused absence" and "unexcused absence"; and to make minor revisions to the education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor Revisions To The Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 437 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 109 AS AMENDED (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 109 AS AMENDED (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-21 | Public Act 11-136 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-19 | File Number 819 | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Calendar Number 523 | |
2011-05-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-17 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-17 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5888 | |
2011-04-26 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-26 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-12 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-04 | File Number 342 | |
2011-04-04 | House Calendar Number 216 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |