CT HB06495 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - File Number 705
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - File Number 705
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) prohibit certain financial institutions from engaging in certain discriminatory conduct, (2) require the Banking Commissioner to implement fair lending examination procedures, and (3) require certain banks to take reasonable measures to make certain residential loan products available to certain areas.
Title
An Act Concerning Equity, Fair Lending And The Banking Commissioner’s Authority To Permit Individuals To Engage In Certain Licensed Or Registered Activities From A Location Other Than A Licensed Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 132 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | File Number 705 |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 450 |
2021-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-18 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-18 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8631 |
2021-05-11 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-11 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-31 | House | File Number 229 |
2021-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 190 |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |