CT HB06484 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the hand-harvesting of horseshoe crabs.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Harvesting Of Horseshoe Crabs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 18 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 18 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-05 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-01 | House | Public Act 23-6 |
2023-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 401 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | House Passed |
2023-03-07 | House | File Number 25 |
2023-03-07 | House | House Calendar Number 41 |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/23 5:00 PM |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |