CT HB06480 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a working group to identify ways to restore eel grass along the state's shoreline.
Title
An Act Establishing A Working Group On The Restoration Of Eel Grass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 388 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 40 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 40 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | House | Special Act 23-7 |
2023-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 443 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2023-03-07 | House | File Number 24 |
2023-03-07 | House | House Calendar Number 40 |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/23 5:00 PM |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |