CT HB06479 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - File Number 204
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - File Number 204
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Labor Commissioner to adopt regulations regarding the efficient operation of the Labor Department.
Title
An Act Concerning The Efficient Operation Of The Labor Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | File Number 204 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 175 |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |