CT HB06467 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Senate Calendar Number 570
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Senate Calendar Number 570
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase access to capital for businesses, opportunity zones and distressed municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Small Business Express Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 323 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 570 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10073 |
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-04-07 | House | File Number 303 |
2021-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 235 |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |