CT HB06462 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require certain employers to pay a quarterly fee to the Labor Commissioner for each employee that receives less than twenty dollars an hour in wages.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recoupment Of State Cost Attributable To Low-wage Employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2023-03-17 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2023-02-02 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2023-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |