CT HB06462 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide an annual report on the state's housing policies and how well they are being addressed through existing programs.
Title
An Act Establishing A Priority Category For The Rental Housing Revolving Loan Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 210 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-05-25 | Public Act 11-42 | |
2011-05-20 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-05-20 | Senate Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Calendar Number 417 | |
2011-04-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | House Passed | |
2011-03-28 | File Number 249 | |
2011-03-28 | House Calendar Number 160 | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |