CT HB06461 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - File Number 264
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - File Number 264
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) implement the recommendations of the task force regarding the prevention and treatment of mental illness at institutions of higher education, (2) require health insurers to maintain explanations of benefits as confidential in certain circumstances, and (3) allow minors to receive more than six outpatient mental health treatment sessions without the consent of a parent or guardian.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Task Force Regarding The Prevention And Treatment Of Mental Illness At Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Gregory Haddad [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | File Number 264 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 218 |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |