CT HB06451 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Authorization, Licensing And Regulation Of Online Casino Gaming, Retail And Online Sports Wagering, Fantasy Contests, Keno And Online Sale Of Lottery Tickets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 162 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 121 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 163 AS AMENDED (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 162 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 121 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 163 AS AMENDED (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Public Act 21-23 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9125 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | File Number 709 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 473 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8985 |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules Suspended |
2021-05-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-04-12 | House | File Number 384 |
2021-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 297 |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |