CT HB06449 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Expanding Economic Opportunity In Occupations Licensed By The Departments Of Public Health And Consumer Protection And Requiring A Report From Certain Executive Branch Agencies Regarding Background Checks And The Feasibility Of Establishing Preclearance Assessments Of Criminal History.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Comey [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R] | Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 459 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 333 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 333 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Public Act 21-152 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 573 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10440 |
2021-03-30 | House | File Number 203 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 174 |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |