CT HB06441 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - File Number 470
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Climate Change Adaptation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseFile Number 470
2021-04-15HouseHouse Calendar Number 339
2021-04-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-04-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-09HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM
2021-03-29HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-29HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-03-03HousePublic Hearing 03/08
2021-02-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback