CT HB06428 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a law enforcement support office program account.
Title
An Act Establishing A Law Enforcement Support Office Program Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | House | File Number 202 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 173 |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |