CT HB06417 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-14-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-14-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require youth camp employees who are eighteen years of age or older to submit to a comprehensive background check.
Title
An Act Requiring Background Checks For Certain Employees Of Youth Camps And Youth Sports Coaches, Trainers And Instructors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 340 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 140 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 140 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | House | Public Act 21-82 |
2021-06-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | House | File Number 701 |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 448 |
2021-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-18 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-18 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8825 |
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 157 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 146 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |