CT HB06416 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To redefine "small contractor" from a definition based on gross revenue to one using the federal standards adopted pursuant to the federal Small Business Act.
Title
An Act Redefining "small Contractor" For Purposes Of The Set-aside Program For Small Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2017-03-08 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-10 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |