CT HB06414 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 561
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-06 - Senate Calendar Number 561
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to conduct a study to determine whether policy and procedural changes within the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection may increase the effectiveness of the use of technology in the state.
Title
An Act Requiring The Study Of The Use Of Technology In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 304 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 561 |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2021-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9979 |
2021-03-16 | House | File Number 56 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 79 |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |