CT HB06410 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - File Number 53
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - File Number 53
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the penalty applicable to telephone solicitors for violations associated with the no sales solicitation calls listing.
Title
An Act Increasing The Penalty For Violations Associated With The No Sales Solicitation Calls Listing.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Rep. Christine Pavalock-D'Amato [R] | Sen. Will Haskell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | File Number 53 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 76 |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |