CT HB06403 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To create a Children in Care Bill of Rights and Expectations for foster children and to require caseworkers to annually provide the Sibling Bill of Rights to foster children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Children In Care Bill Of Rights And Expectations And The Sibling Bill Of Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 323 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 33 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-44
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-22HouseFile Number 768
2019-04-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 374
2019-04-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-17HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7128
2019-03-25HouseFile Number 117
2019-03-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 95
2019-03-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-05HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback