CT HB06403 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the parent or legal guardian of a minor child to place a security freeze on the minor child's credit report.
Title
An Act Concerning Security Freezes On Children's Credit Reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 314 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-10 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-10 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-02 | House | Public Act 15-62 |
2015-05-28 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-08 | House | File Number 791 |
2015-05-08 | House | Senate Calendar Number 461 |
2015-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-06 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6828 |
2015-03-19 | House | File Number 113 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 89 |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |
2015-02-10 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |