CT HB06398 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To allow (1) patients in the maximum security building at Whiting Forensic Hospital to be present during routine searches of personal belongings and to add two members to the hospital's advisory board, and (2) the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services to use one electronic health record system that all clinical staff can use for documentation across all department clinics and hospitals.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions To Statutes Concerning The Department Of Mental Health And Addiction Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 356 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 178 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 178 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-15 | House | Public Act 21-75 |
2021-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 501 |
2021-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 154 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 143 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |