CT HB06392 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 1000
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow the use of automated traffic enforcement safety devices within highway work zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Maintenance Work Zone Safety Enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 203 AS AMENDED (Y: 70 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseFile Number 1000
2019-05-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 628
2019-05-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
2019-05-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 9409
2019-05-23HouseAmendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 9211
2019-05-21HouseBill Passed Temporarily
2019-05-21HouseHouse Designated House Amendment Schedule A 9211
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 470
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 295
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation
2019-03-15HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-08HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/13
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback