CT HB06385 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) include chicken eggs as part of the state-funded Connecticut Farmers' Market/WIC and Senior Nutrition programs, (2) increase fines for violating certain farm product grading and marketing requirements, (3) provide the Commissioner of Agriculture with infraction authority for the violation of statutes under the commissioner's authority, and (4) increase vouchers for said nutrition programs.
Title
An Act Concerning Enhancements To Certain Agricultural Programs.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Sen. Joan Hartley [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] |
Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] | Rep. Brian Smith [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Kathy Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 453 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 341 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 341 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-155 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 576 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | House | File Number 134 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 128 |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |