CT HB06382 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow Probate Court employees to be recognized as state employees for the purpose of collective bargaining.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Status Of Probate Court System Employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-09HouseFile Number 28
2021-03-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 58
2021-03-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-03-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM
2021-02-24HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-02-18HouseJoint Favorable
2021-02-04HousePublic Hearing 02/09
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback