CT HB06379 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - File Number 429
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - File Number 429
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To protect workers by specifying certain conditions for covenants not to compete.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Employees' Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | File Number 429 |
2021-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 321 |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing 02/09 |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |