CT HB06377 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred by House to Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require labor peace agreements for the cannabis industry and to ensure a modern and equitable cannabis workforce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Labor Peace Agreements And A Modern And Equitable Cannabis Workforce.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on General Law
2021-05-17HouseRules Suspended
2021-05-17HouseHouse Reconsidered and Retained
2021-05-17HouseRules Suspended
2021-05-11HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-15HouseFile Number 462
2021-04-15HouseHouse Calendar Number 338
2021-04-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-04-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-09HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM
2021-03-29HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-02-04HousePublic Hearing 02/09
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback