CT HB06376 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To redefine "peace officer" to include a motor vehicle inspector who is certified as a police officer and make conforming changes.
Title
An Act Concerning Motor Vehicle Inspectors As Peace Officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 427 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 251 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 251 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 19-108 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-31 | Senate | File Number 1021 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 657 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2019-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8055 |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 401 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 253 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2019-02-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |