CT HB06373 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - File Number 52
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - File Number 52
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To protect the interests of prior title holders by requiring the state of Connecticut to record certain liens against real property in the land records of the municipality or municipalities in which the real property is situated.
Title
An Act Preserving The Interests Of Prior Title Holders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | File Number 52 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 75 |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing 02/09 |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |