CT HB06372 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require that financial institutions leave certain exempt funds in a judgment debtor's account.
Title
An Act Exempting From Execution Certain Funds In A Judgment Debtor's Account.
Sponsors
House Banking Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] |
Rep. Caroline Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 412 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-131 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | File Number 781 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 545 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2021-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9541 |
2021-03-16 | House | File Number 51 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 74 |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing 02/09 |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |