CT HB06352 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 611
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 611
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify how the distance between existing and proposed community residences or child-care residential facilities should be measured for zoning purposes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Zoning Of Community Residences And Child-care Residential Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 611 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 365 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |