CT HB06347 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - File Number 827
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - File Number 827
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Administrative Services to award more state contracts for print and digital advertising to nonprofit entities and Connecticut-owned media outlet entities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Purchase Of Print And Digital Advertising By The State.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Kate Farrar [D] | Rep. Kara Rochelle [D] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] |
Rep. Hubert Delany [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 164 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 96 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 165 AS AMENDED (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 165 AS AMENDED (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | File Number 827 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 555 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8457 |
2023-04-17 | House | File Number 613 |
2023-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 395 |
2023-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-03-14 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |