CT HB06345 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Public Hearing 02/08
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Public Hearing 02/08
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To alert potential land buyers that abutting properties may pose a potential threat to them and their families.
Title
An Act Requiring The Posting Of Notice When Land Abuts Other Property Subject To An Environmental Land Use Restriction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/08 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-02-01 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |