CT HB06335 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the sale and trade of ivory and rhinoceros horn in the state.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Sale And Trade Of Ivory And Rhinoceros Horn In Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | No Action |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | File Number 257 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 197 |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-02-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |