CT HB06327 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To not require the approval of the State Properties Review Board for certain amendments to total cost basis construction contracts.
Title
An Act Concerning The Approval Of Amendments To Total Cost Basis Construction State Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-10 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |