CT HB06292 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 681
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow a landlord to produce certain documents to prove such landlord is not residing at a rental property owned by such landlord for purposes of contesting motor vehicle tax assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Motor Vehicle Tax Assessments For Certain Owners Of Rental Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 681
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 417
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-03-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-03-08HouseVote to Draft
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-13HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-02-06HouseChange of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
2019-02-06HouseChange of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
2019-02-05HouseChange of Reference Planning and Development
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback