CT HB06291 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - File Number 934
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To clarify and enforce protections for licensed group child care homes and licensed family child care homes and prevent landlords and certain homeowners associations from placing restrictions on the operation of such homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Protections For Certain Group Child Care And Family Child Care Homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 142 AS AMENDED (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseFile Number 934
2019-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 539
2019-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8819
2019-04-19HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-19HouseNo New File by Committee on Planning and Development
2019-04-18HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-17HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 181
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 131
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing
2019-03-05HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-05HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06291&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R03-HB.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R00HSG-CV4-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R00HSG-CV31-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R00HSG-CV45-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R00HSG-CV60-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R00HSG-CV69-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-06291-R00PD-CV184-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00142-R00HB06291-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback