CT HB06285 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 631
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 631
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect children from secondhand smoke while riding in a motor vehicle.
Title
An Act Concerning Smoking In Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 289 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Calendar Number 631 |
2015-05-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2015-05-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8740 |
2015-05-30 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8062 |
2015-04-16 | House | File Number 674 |
2015-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 436 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |