CT HB06240 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-26 - Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide municipalities with payment in lieu of taxes for state housing authority properties.
Title
An Act Concerning Payment In Lieu Of Taxes For State Housing Authority Properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2021-02-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |