CT HB06203 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To facilitate the repatriation of Native American remains and artifacts by enabling state institutions to keep confidential any records provided as evidence that ancestral remains or artifacts were affiliated with a particular tribe.
Title
An Act Exempting Certain Records Concerning Native American Cultural Knowledge From Public Disclosure Under The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 387 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 61 (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 61 (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-23 | House | Public Act 21-114 |
2021-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-07 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 379 |
2021-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | House Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | File Number 468 |
2021-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 335 |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-19 | House | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-17 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |