CT HB06187 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Public Hearing 03/15
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Public Hearing 03/15
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To restructure certain taxes to assist in the economic recovery of all state residents and require the Labor Commissioner to make a one-time direct payment of five hundred dollars to individuals who experienced economic hardships due to the COVID-19 pandemic and received unemployment compensation benefits between March 15, 2020, and December 31, 2020, inclusive.
Title
An Act Concerning The Restructuring Of Certain Taxes And Tax Equity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2021-02-17 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |