CT HB06151 | 2013 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To create an exception in the workers' compensation statutes for owner/operators of motor vehicles with a minimum gross vehicle weight of ten thousand pounds and who transport property, at least in part, in interstate commerce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Certain Operators Of Motor Vehicles And Eligibility For Unemployment Benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 502 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-06-11HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2013-06-10HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2013-06-06HousePublic Act 13-168
2013-06-01HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2013-06-01HouseSenate Passed
2013-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 624
2013-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2013-05-16HouseHouse Passed
2013-05-01HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2013-05-01HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2013-05-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-05-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-05-01HouseJoint Favorable
2013-04-25HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2013-04-03HouseFile Number 327
2013-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 227
2013-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2013-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM
2013-03-19HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2013-03-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2013-03-15HouseDrafted by Committee
2013-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2013-02-21HousePublic Hearing 02/26
2013-02-14HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2013-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback