CT HB06122 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Public Hearing 03/06
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Public Hearing 03/06
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reevaluate the existing valuation and taxation structure for farm land.
Title
An Act Concerning The Valuation And Taxation Of Farmland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-02-28 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |