CT HB06111 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Youth Suicide Advisory Board and the Office of the Child Advocate to establish a youth suicide prevention pilot program.
Title
An Act Establishing A Youth Suicide Prevention Training Program.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Rep. Mary Welander [D] | Rep. Jaime Foster [D] |
Rep. Christine Palm [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-11 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | House | File Number 19 |
2021-03-09 | House | House Calendar Number 49 |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-01-29 | House | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |