CT HB06111 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 397
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow employers to control their costs of doing business by allowing them to automatically enroll their employees into direct paycheck deposit programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Study Of Automatic Direct Paycheck Deposit Programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 397
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 250
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback