CT HB06107 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) restructure the Zoning Enabling Act for clarity, (2) promote the purposes of the federal Fair Housing Act, (3) provide an administrative mechanism to promote compliance with municipal affordable housing plans, and (4) require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to convene a working group to study municipal affordable housing plans and zoning regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Zoning Enabling Act, Accessory Apartments, Training For Certain Land Use Officials, Municipal Affordable Housing Plans And A Commission On Connecticut’s Development And Future.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 288 (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 289 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 287 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 160 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 51 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 161 AS AMENDED (Y: 84 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-06-04HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-04HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-03HousePublic Act 21-29
2021-05-27HouseIn Concurrence
2021-05-27HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-27HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9496
2021-05-27HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 9501
2021-05-27HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-24HouseFile Number 716
2021-05-24HouseSenate Calendar Number 477
2021-05-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-05-20HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-20HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9006
2021-05-20HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8977
2021-04-21HouseFile Number 541
2021-04-21HouseHouse Calendar Number 385
2021-04-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-04-21HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-15HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM
2021-04-05HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-31HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-03-11HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06107&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06107-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06107-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00029-R00HB-06107-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/H/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00HB-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/H/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00HA-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08975-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08980-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08983-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08976-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08984-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09496-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09500-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09498-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09497-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/H/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00SA-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06107-R000541-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06107-R000541-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO08977-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO08975-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO08976-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO08984-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO08980-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO08983-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO09006-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06107-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06107-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06107-R010716-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06107-R010716-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO09497-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO09500-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO09501-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO09498-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06107-R00LCO09496-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/SUM/PDF/2021SUM00029-R02HB-06107-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/H/PDF/2021HB-06107-R00PD-CV102-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00161-R00HB06107-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00160-R00HB06107-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00287-R00HB06107-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00289-R00HB06107-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00288-R00HB06107-SV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback