CT HB06091 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 02/28
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 02/28
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Insurance Commissioner to offer English and Spanish language versions of examinations administered to certain applicants for licenses from the commissioner.
Title
An Act Requiring The Insurance Commissioner To Offer English And Spanish Language Versions Of Examinations Administered To Certain Licensees In This State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |