CT HB06088 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To subject dentists, dental plans and procedures to fee transparency requirements that apply to contracts between other providers and contracting health organizations.
Title
An Act Concerning Contracting Health Organizations And Dentists, Dental Plans And Procedures.
Sponsors
House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Rep. William Petit [R] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Sen. George Logan [R] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 361 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 383 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 383 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 19-155 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 696 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10504 |
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 280 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 186 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |